CIVIL MEDIATION COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to be a neutral and independent body set up for the benefit of the public to: - promote the resolution of conflicts and disputes by encouraging the use of mediation and other dispute resolution techniques and methods; and - advance the education of the public in matters of mediation and other dispute resolution techniques and methods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 August 2015: Standard registration
- CMC (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Gersch | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Sigacheva | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isabel Aline Phillips | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Collis | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nirupar Hasna Uddin | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicolas Fournier | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Levitt | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence John RENOUF | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Steinfeld | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Jackson-Stops | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDY ROGERS | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.15k | £108.91k | £125.76k | £142.69k | £142.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.39k | £95.56k | £104.55k | £161.90k | £207.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2018 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO BE A NEUTRAL AND INDEPENDENT BODY SET UP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO: 2.1 PROMOTE THE RESOLUTION OF CONFLICTS AND DISPUTES BY ENCOURAGING THE USE OF MEDIATION AND OTHER DISPUTE RESOLUTION TECHNIQUES AND METHODS; AND 2.2 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS OF MEDIATION AND OTHER DISPUTE RESOLUTION TECHNIQUES AND METHODS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 St Pauls Churchyard
3rd floor
LONDON
EC4M 8BU
- Phone:
- 07841 017905
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window