Financial history MOSSLEY AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1160167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £84.76k £31.95k £43.73k £56.95k £72.29k
Total expenditure £71.74k £15.38k £49.45k £56.25k £66.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £640 £20.00k N/A N/A N/A