Trustees MOSSLEY AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1160167

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Meredith Hoyle | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Ward | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Noble | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Goddard | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Egerton | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Harrison | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Rose | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Firth | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Devlin | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Hughes | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Farrow | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wood | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Maurice | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA FURNESS | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.