Financial history THE FAMILIES & FRIENDS OF THE OLDHAM MUSIC CENTRE

Charity Number: 1162513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.89k £3.66k £4.58k £7.20k £62.54k
Total expenditure £6.16k £2.39k £944 £18.86k £5.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A