GREAT ELLINGHAM PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school education for children aged 2 - school age. A rural committee run pre-school in a rural location.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £62,039 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 10 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynnette Christine Leslie | Chair | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Stimpson | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ede | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tammy-Jo Gardiner | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.26k | £68.94k | £86.38k | £90.70k | £87.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.84k | £66.62k | £80.02k | £73.06k | £97.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £62.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.95k | £49.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 January 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 January 2025 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 25 February 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 25 February 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN GREAT ELLINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: A)PROVIDING SAFE AND STIMULATING PLAY AND ACTIVITIES, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART B)ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN C)FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRESCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Recreation Centre
Watton Road
Great Ellingham
ATTLEBOROUGH
Norfolk
NR17 1HZ
- Phone:
- 07443562555
- Email:
- ge.ps@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window