MERLIN MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides concerts of classical music for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Monmouthshire
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29k | £0 | £0 | £37.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.05k | £662 | £144 | £7 | £420 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 15 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 15 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 15 March 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 23 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 29 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF NOT LESS THAN SIX PROFESSIONAL PUBLIC CONCERTS PER SEASON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE SOUTH EAST WALES)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window