MERSEYSIDE DOGS HOME LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Merseyside Dogs Home takes in abandoned dogs from across the Merseyside region, rehabilitating them and finding them suitable new homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Total income includes £14,143 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 02 June 2015: Standard registration
- MERSEYSIDE DOGS HOME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DUNNE | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Melanie Walsh | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Meaney | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Campbell | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH DUNNE | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.91k | £235.75k | £218.10k | £186.64k | £89.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.18k | £285.20k | £214.87k | £171.74k | £61.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.00k | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £40.25k | £14.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 733 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 733 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/05/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WHO I) SUFFER FROM ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL AND MENTAL) INCLUDING THE INSTITUTIONALISED ELDERLY, II) ARE HOMELESS OR III) ARE RECENTLY RELEASED PRISON DETAINEES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH ACTIVITIES WITH COMPANION ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level One
Basecamp Liverpool
49 Jamaica Street
Liverpool
L1 0AH
- Phone:
- 01514873592
- Email:
- info@merseysidedogshome.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window