Accounts and annual returns WALKLEY CARNEGIE LIBRARY

Charity Number: 1159745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window