Trustees START NETWORK
Charity number: 1159483
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sanjayan Srikanthan | Chair | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Salome Mulangala Ntububa | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Iqbal Rafiq | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm David Spence | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Glyn Isherwood | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Amad | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anwer Iqbal | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.