Accounts and annual returns Beyond Borders Outreach

Charity Number: 1159703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2023 18 March 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2023 18 March 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2022 18 March 2024 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2022 18 March 2024 447 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2021 18 March 2024 812 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 18 March 2024 812 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2020 18 March 2024 1177 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 18 March 2024 1177 days late Download Open in new window