Trustees THE SABRE TRUST
Charity number: 1161190
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS PHIL FARMER | Chair | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Guy Blundell | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darron Phillips | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Stuart Smith | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William David Porter | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MISS VIV MILLS | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN KENNETH MASTERS | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MS KAT MOON | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.