Trustees HOSTAGE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1161072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donald Melville McGown Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Sarah Katharine Gleadhall Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Niall Andrew McEnery MacGinnis Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
James Brandon Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Jantine Van Hervijnen Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Pulina Whitaker Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Claire Browne Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record
Elisabeth Anne Bassett Trustee 27 February 2018
THE BEDFORD PARK SOCIETY
Received: On time
SAIDIA CHILDREN'S CHARITY (KENYA)
Received: On time
Michael Donald Millward Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
PHILIP BIGLEY CERT ED Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record