Financial history CHRISTIAN LIGHT CENTRE

Charity number: 1159613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £8.17k £6.31k £3.11k £15.37k £12.11k
Total expenditure £2.81k £8.27k £9.06k £5.05k £5.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A