Popham Kidney Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide all Kidney Patients in Wales with a better quality of life. Putting Patients First, helping them believe in themselves to achieve a better quality of life for them and their families. Providing support services that share information, advice and emotional support through our Peer Mentor Services and supporting projects that improve facilities, patients welfare and wellbeing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2015: CIO registration
- PAUL POPHAM FUND (Working name)
- Popham Kidney Support (Working name)
- PAUL POPHAM FUND, RENAL SUPPORT WALES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNNE DENISE ORTON | Chair | 23 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Dawson | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhian Gwilliam | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Lewys Richards | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Howe | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Loosmore | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hickman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sheppard | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Turner | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashraf Mikhail | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SHEFFIELD | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/05/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.31k | £169.48k | £194.84k | £158.18k | £197.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.82k | £108.97k | £146.24k | £185.12k | £207.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jan 2015 as amended on 27 Jun 2019 as amended on 16 Aug 2022 as amended on 05 Jul 2023 as amended on 06 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF RENAL PATIENTS IN WALES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISIONS OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWS LETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTH CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Tawe Business Village
Enterprise Park
Llansamlet
Swansea
SA7 9LA
- Phone:
- 03332001285
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window