FRANCIS CLARK CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective of the Foundation is to alleviate financial hardship by providing assistance to individuals, in particular: 1. Partners or employees of Francis Clark 2. Former partners or employees of Francis Clark 3. Individuals considered dependents of 1 or 2 above the Foundation will also consider an application for a grant from an organisation working to relieve financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CLIFF | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Hooper | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Collins | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Towers | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Benjamin Wilson | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Charles Beck | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Kennedy | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Charles Lannin | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Whitcomb | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER GEORGE SERJEANT | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.50k | £37.50k | £62.50k | £62.50k | £77.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.37k | £3.25k | £14.46k | £61.32k | £35.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 January 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 19 January 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 January 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 19 January 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION), ANY PARTNER, FORMER PARTNER, EMPLOYEE OR FORMER EMPLOYEE OF FRANCIS CLARK (OR ANY ASSOCIATED COMPANY), OR ANY SPOUSE, BROTHER, SISTER, STEPBROTHER, STEPSISTER, ANCESTOR OR DESCENDANT OF SUCH EMPLOYEE, OR ANY OTHER PERSON WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, IS DEPENDENT UPON SUCH PARTNER, FORMER PARTNER, EMPLOYEE OR FORMER EMPLOYEE; AND 2. SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Lady Park Road
TORQUAY
TQ2 6UA
- Phone:
- 01803605738
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window