CENTRAL CHESHIRE BUDDY SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activity clubs and short breaks for children, young people, adults and their families with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £46,079 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 17 February 2015: CIO registration
- CCBS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON LAWLEY | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SPENCER | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN TRINER | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EDWARDS | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE MURRAY | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.24k | £182.29k | £146.24k | £146.59k | £125.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.49k | £146.05k | £166.78k | £157.13k | £160.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.00k | £21.00k | £23.34k | £21.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £20.16k | £38.23k | £8.10k | £46.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES (UP TO THE AGE OF 25), THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS, LIVING IN CHESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARENTS AND CARERS OF A DISABLED CHILD AS A BREAK FROM THEIR CARING ROLES AND RESPONSIBILITIES, THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF SUPPORT AND RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Nevis Drive
Crewe
CW2 8UH
- Phone:
- 07873423389
- Email:
- cheshirebuddies@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window