THE POIRIER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN WINTERTON, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS, INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, DAY CARE SERVICES, LUNCH CLUB AND ACTIVITIES TO MAINTAIN GOOD HEALTH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 January 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MIKE JOYCE DIP CII | Chair | 22 January 2015 |
|
|||||
DENISE MAXINE PAYNE | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Carol Richardson | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH PICK | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS NICKI MUMBY | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|||||
MR JIM HARDING CityGuilds MECH ENG | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.82k | £19.56k | £4.33k | £12.09k | £12.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.34k | £14.78k | £9.14k | £12.50k | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN WINTERTON, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS, INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, DAY CARE SERVICES, LUNCH CLUB AND ACTIVITIES TO MAINTAIN GOOD HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Low Street
Winterton
SCUNTHORPE
DN15 9RT
- Phone:
- 01724732214
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window