Financial history Restorers 58

Charity number: 1160234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £505.60k £490.27k £437.85k £469.45k £1.01m
Total expenditure £508.71k £464.05k £511.77k £521.81k £738.79k
Income from government contracts £188.12k £180.92k £186.85k £163.48k £46.76k
Income from government grants N/A £43.75k £2.48k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £114.70k N/A N/A N/A £12.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £363.44k N/A N/A N/A £171.36k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £21.58k N/A N/A N/A £22.86k
Income - Other £5.88k N/A N/A N/A £805.72k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £508.71k N/A N/A N/A £738.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.47k N/A N/A N/A £253.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0