CORNERSTONE GLOBAL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cornerstone global Ministries operates as a Christian church in Southampton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANNY KUNDA | Chair | 10 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
FLORANCE ROTAZIBWA | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MOORE | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY TOROKWA | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NACHINGA KUNDA | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK TOROKWA | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
YOLLANDA RHODAH AUGUSTIN | Trustee | 17 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.47k | £4.80k | £8.30k | £20.13k | £22.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.47k | £3.70k | £8.17k | £17.30k | £16.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Luck Road
Bursledon
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 8LR
- Phone:
- 07494688962
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window