NONCLASSICAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nonclassical benefits the public through: - encouraging the appreciation and development of contemporary classical music by organising events in non-traditional ways and settings whilst working with high quality performers - mentoring of up and coming musicians, composers and event promoters - producing and distributing recordings - organising related activities as the Trustees shall determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,242 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Brazil
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Latvia
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 18 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William David Frank Norris | Chair | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Davey CBE | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clifton Harrison | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Aileen Margaret Douthwaite | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rune Bech | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nick Rampley | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.50k | £159.42k | £184.47k | £173.56k | £193.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.04k | £121.35k | £165.80k | £185.97k | £160.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS BY ENCOURAGING THE APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CONTEMPORARY CLASSICAL MUSIC BY ORGANISING EVENTS IN NON-TRADITIONAL WAYS AND SETTINGS WHILST WORKING WITH HIGH QUALITY PERFORMERS, MENTORING OF UP AND COMING MUSICIANS, COMPOSERS AND EVENT PROMOTERS, BY PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING RECORDINGS AND THROUGH ORGANISING RELATED ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nonclassical
Oxford House
Derbyshire Street
LONDON
E2 6HG
- Phone:
- 0207 739 5791
- Email:
- natalia@nonclassical.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window