Financial history THE AMETHYST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/11/2019 27/11/2020 27/11/2021 27/11/2022 27/11/2023
Total gross income £0 £8.80k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £8.80k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A