THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STUDLEY ST JOHN, TROWBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish church providing regular worship open to all. Community support with use of church hall. Mission & pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved; teaching of Christianity through sermons, bible and prayer groups. Providing children's activities with Christian ethos; activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, etc. Support of charities in UK & overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 March 2015: Previously excepted registration
- 26 April 2017: Funds received from 289677 ST JOHN'S COMMUNICATION CENTRE
- ST JOHN'S, UPPER STUDLEY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Margaret Oaten | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Price | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Ann Rose | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Bridges | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Raymond Thorne | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Collisson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Solman | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lorraine Thorne | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jeremy Bridges | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAWN SAWYER | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARGARET THOMPSON | Trustee | 01 February 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.99k | £92.00k | £67.68k | £75.41k | £62.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.40k | £161.46k | £109.96k | £76.56k | £51.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Westfield Road
TROWBRIDGE
Wiltshire
BA14 9JL
- Phone:
- 01225774976
- Email:
- info@stjohns-studley.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window