Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STUDLEY ST JOHN, TROWBRIDGE
Charity Number: 1160751

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Margaret Oaten | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Price | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Ann Rose | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Bridges | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Raymond Thorne | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Collisson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Solman | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lorraine Thorne | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jeremy Bridges | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAWN SAWYER | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARGARET THOMPSON | Trustee | 01 February 1998 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.