THE UK GERMAN SHEPHERD RESCUE ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating, rescuing, rehabilitating and rehoming German Shepherds and gsd crosses throughout the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2015: CIO registration
- UK GSR ANGELS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miss S Syers | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr K Syers | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.18k | £85.00k | £75.00k | £70.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.45k | £73.00k | £74.00k | £68.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR GERMAN SHEPHERD DOGS INCLUDING CROSS BREEDS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS;AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY GERMAN SHEPHERD DOGS AND CROSS BREEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elswick Kennels
Bonds Lane
Elswick
PRESTON
PR4 3ZE
- Phone:
- 07789881850
- Email:
- gsdsuze@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window