FRIENDS AND PLACES TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are based in Southend and our services were formed in Southend on Sea with funding from Southend Borough Council. The aim of Friends and Places Together is to seek friendships for isolated and vulnerable people within our community. Primarily we offer support to young people from 13 to 25 years old but we have had many requests to support all people that are isolated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £8,490 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 11 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
paige dabbs | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
julie jackson | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jones | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Woolard | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Bennet | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SATHYENDRAN RAVIRAJ | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.46k | £88.00k | £163.09k | £147.44k | £162.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.77k | £112.00k | £114.27k | £146.45k | £173.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.49k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/05/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE NEED BY REASON OF DISABILITY AND ILL-HEALTH AMONG YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR CARERS BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR CARERS; C) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR CARERS; AND D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victoria Shopping Centre
Top Floor - Units F13 and F 14
362 Chartwell Square
Southend on Sea
SS2 5SP
- Phone:
- 07956602570
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window