OPEN DOORS NETWORK

Charity Number: 1160706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Open Doors Network is a Christian Church in Southborough, Tunbridge Wells. The charity's activities include main worship services, prayer and bible study, periodic evangelistical meetings, outreach activities such as healing on the streets and Go teams based on a variety of different activities to serve the community, weekly youth and children's groups and gifts to missionaries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £492,368
Total expenditure: £522,475

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 2015: CIO registration
  • 18 February 2022: Funds received from 1022370 NEW LIFE CHURCH
  • 19 May 2025: Funds received from 1126344 GOOD NEIGHBOUR PROJECT
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joseph Wesley Robinson Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Antony Darnell Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
VICTORIA ANNE ROSS Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record
DAVID ROY KING Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record
PHILIP ROY WATSON Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record
Richard John Berkley Trustee 02 March 2015
PEOPLE INTERNATIONAL WORLDWIDE
Received: On time
PEOPLE INTERNATIONAL PROJECTS LTD
Received: On time
Kathryn Emily Green Trustee 02 March 2015
SOUTHBOROUGH CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MERJA-LIISA TELLERVO WICKHAM Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record
STEPHEN WILLIAM MCVEIGH Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £279.15k £258.17k £342.80k £325.46k £492.37k
Total expenditure £258.23k £242.13k £315.31k £331.35k £522.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD AMBULANCE STATION
SPELDHURST ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
KENT
TN4 0JA
Phone:
01892687050