Financial history THE GLOBE CHURCH

Charity Number: 1160195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £361.70k £346.18k £330.11k £345.51k £404.74k
Total expenditure £290.60k £222.19k £339.39k £356.56k £431.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A