THE DYLAN O'BRIEN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raised significant awareness of Metabolic and Genetic Disorders.Itv Documentaries and new Sleep Apnoea Machines to UHW we supplied another 6 Sleep Apnoea Monitors to the UHW. Supplied a number of lifesaving equipment to members of the community who have children with Metabolic disorders.In January of this year The Dylan OBrien Foundation won an Community Award for Health and Wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 February 2015: Standard registration
- 24 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- VOICES FOR DYLAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/06/2016 | 18/06/2017 | 18/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £235 | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £510 | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 18 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 18 June 2018 | 26 April 2019 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 June 2017 | 23 June 2018 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION TO PARENTS AND FAMILY MEMBERS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING WITH A METABOLIC/GENERIC DISORDER AND TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERTISE OF HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND OTHERS IN DEALING WITH AND DIAGNOSING SUCH DISORDERS. (2) TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM METABOLIC DISEASES AND THEIR FAMILY, FRIENDS AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window