THE WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE BENEVOLENT AND LOANS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve those in necessitious circumstances among serving or former members of the Force
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 13 September 1976: Standard registration
- 29 October 2014: Funds received from 228888 THE WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE LOANS FUND
- THE WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- WEST YORKSHIRE METROPOLITAN POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Osman Khan | Chair | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David James Bates | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Craig GRANDISON | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Scholefield | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Gilert | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Barry Claxton | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sareth Anne Humpage | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Moorhouse | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Reeves | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Henry Bentley | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ikram Ullah Ditta | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Craig Nichols | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.04k | £40.15k | £22.11k | £22.30k | £24.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.26k | £34.09k | £41.79k | £69.79k | £42.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/07/1976 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/1992 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2016 as amended on 22 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG SERVING POLICE OFFICERS OR SPECIAL CONSTABULARY OFFICERS AND POLICE PENSIONERS OF THE FORCE AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, ALSO WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF DECEASED POLICE OFFICERS AND POLICE PENSIONERS OF THE FORCE (INCLUDING PENSIONERS OF THE FORMER BARNSLEY BOROUGH, BRADFORD CITY, DEWSBURY BOROUGH, DONCASTER BOROUGH, HALIFAX BOROUGH, HUDDERSFIELD BOROUGH LEEDS CITY AND WAKEFIELD CITY POLICE FORCES ALSO THE WEST RIDING AND WEST YORKSHIRE CONSTABULARIES) BY PROVIDING SUCH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE INDIVIDUALS AS THE COMMITTEE DEEMS APPROPRIATE IN THE CIRCUMSTANCES AND THIS SHALL INCLUDE PROVIDING INTEREST FREE LOANS FROM TIME TO TIME TO SERVING POLICE OFFICERS WHO ARE IN TEMPORARY FINANCIAL DIFFICULTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINANCE DEPT
LABURNUM ROAD
WAKEFIELD
WF1 3QP
- Phone:
- 01924 295493
- Email:
- wybenfund@polfed.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window