CUCKMERE HAVEN SOS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment of the Cuckmere Haven West Beach and Cliffs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 05 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Michael Charles Radcliffe Davies CEng FICE | Chair | 09 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Caroline Lucas | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Daniel De Belder | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Russell Peck | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Alan George Moses | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
CRISPIN PATRICK FREEMAN | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
R CASTLEDEN ESQ MA, MSC OXON | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.83k | £6.09k | £19.63k | £5.61k | £23.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.27k | £24.49k | £21.75k | £2.49k | £46.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 May 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE CUCKMERE HAVEN WEST BEACH AND CLIFFS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sanctuary
Winton Street
Alfriston
POLEGATE
BN26 5UL
- Phone:
- 07506726638
- Email:
- cuckmerehavensos@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window