Financial history DIDCOT AND WALLINGFORD AREA CAP DEBT CENTRE

Charity number: 1160343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £37.54k £34.02k £39.08k £43.86k £51.92k
Total expenditure £38.63k £37.57k £40.78k £42.74k £42.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A