HERNE BAY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management and development of Herne Bay Museum, 12 William Street, Herne Bay, Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 05 February 2015: CIO registration
- HBMT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Clair Saunders | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Francis McKeown | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Iain Nigel Ward Farquhar | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Eileen Wellings | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sarah Hopcraft | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Downing | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.04k | £51.60k | £37.60k | £42.23k | £43.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.62k | £38.39k | £38.69k | £53.02k | £50.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.00k | £15.00k | £15.00k | £15.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | £15.00k | £15.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM IN HERNE BAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE EXHIBITION OF ITEMS OF LOCAL OR HISTORICAL INTEREST AND PROVISION OF EDUCATION RELATING TO THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE TOWN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Seaside Museum
12 William Street
Herne Bay
Kent
CT6 5EJ
- Phone:
- 01227367368
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window