IMAGINE IF THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We instigate active change in peoples lives through arts-based interventions, workshops and productions. People with experience of the care system and criminal justice system are at the forefront of our work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,924 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 17 March 2015: CIO registration
- IMAGINE THEATRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jane | Chair | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Michael Bloomfield | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathrine Ives | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE DICKINSON | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Hannah Eugenie Tookey | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.08k | £122.81k | £192.53k | £33.51k | £104.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.91k | £87.05k | £170.59k | £51.40k | £115.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.44k | N/A | N/A | £39.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 17 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE CAUSES AND CONSEQUENCES OF ISSUES OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE BY ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES AND WORKSHOPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Slung Low at Temple
131 Water Lane
Leeds
LS11 9UD
- Phone:
- 07495645412
- Email:
- admin@imagineiftheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window