THE WORKING PARTY THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through a marriage of outreach and community work and theatrical expertise, we create theatre projects and performances that bring together people and ideas to build new connections and inspire new ways of thinking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 April 2015: CIO registration
- TWP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAUDE FREDERICK WILLIAM ALLESTON BA LLB | Chair | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CHRISTOPHER SPELLMAN SIU | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NATHALIE FRANCE | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.85k | £32.59k | £1.83k | £45.50k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.44k | £8.86k | £25.57k | £33.95k | £18.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, APPRECIATION AND PARTICIPATION IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 22
Walcot House
East Dulwich Estate
London
SE22 8AD
- Phone:
- 07740309115
- Email:
- info@theworkingpartyuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window