THE EQUALITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to improve the quality of life in the UK through the reduction of economic inequality. We do this by researching and disseminating research on inequality in the UK, aiming to highlight areas of good and bad policy and practice. We also support a network of local group activists, who work to raise awareness of, and reduce, economic inequality in their local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Hill | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Allanson | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yamini Cinamon Nair | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chi Lael | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Boyle | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Henry Weyman | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £346.09k | £318.90k | £323.62k | £384.56k | £321.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.04k | £315.71k | £347.09k | £339.72k | £311.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.99k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 06 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 2022 as amended on 01 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH UNDERTAKING AND/OR PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE SCALE, DEVELOPMENT, CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF SOCIO-ECONOMIC INEQUALITY AND MEANS TO REDUCE SOCIO-ECONOMIC INEQUALITY, PUBLISHING, OR PROCURING THE PUBLICATION OF, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, INCLUDING THROUGH THE RELIEF OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC NEED AND DISADVANTAGE RELATED, IN WHOLE OR PART, TO SOCIO-ECONOMIC INEQUALITY; 3) TO ADVANCE HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH IDENTIFYING AND ADDRESSING PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES ARISING, IN WHOLE OR PART, FROM SOCIO-ECONOMIC INEQUALITY; 4) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR SOCIO-ECONOMIC EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITHIN SOCIO-ECONOMIC GROUPS;5) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BEING DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Square Root Business Centre
102-116 Windmill Road
CROYDON
CR0 2XQ
- Phone:
- 02036370324
- Email:
- info@equalitytrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window