Trustees HUMAN RIGHTS AT SEA
Charity number: 1161673
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Vickers | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Steven William Haines | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Russell George Harding | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aidan Joseph McQuade | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marika Wen McAdam | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stavis | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Crowell | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Kemp | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.