SCHOOL GROUND SOUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using the power of music, Grounded Sounds (formerly SGS) transforms the lives of young people aged 11 - 24 from disadvantaged backgrounds in lower income areas of London. Through a variety of programmes the charity provides high quality, creative experiences that develop musical talent and build confidence and life skills, supporting the transition into adulthood and improving career prospects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 December 2014: CIO registration
- Grounded Sounds (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Anthony Keohane | Chair | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Speranza Sabrina Barone | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael James Cartwright | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES SCOTT | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACK KEELING | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.57k | £129.50k | £159.97k | £153.87k | £176.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.74k | £127.91k | £139.52k | £159.85k | £180.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.20k | £18.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS BY HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE AND SCHOOL COMMUNITIES TO ACCESS THE MUSIC PRODUCTION PROCESS AND MUSICAL ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND PROMOTE ENGAGEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 HENDERSON ROAD
LONDON
SW18 3RR
- Phone:
- 07907481282
- Email:
- info@schoolgroundsounds.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window