CUMBRIA VICTIMS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cumbria Victims Charitable Trust generates additional income to supplement the funding provided by the Ministry of Justice for victims services. The Trust assists by expanding services to support the needs of victims of crime and antisocial behaviour who are in need of financial assistance to help meet costs incurred as a result of their becoming the victim crime or antisocial behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Cumbria
Governance
- 19 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNETTE HAZEL HENNESSY OBE | Chair | 13 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Natalie Bradbury | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Elaine Reid Fotheringham | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr VENETIA YOUNG | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Marriott | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ARMSTRONG MBE | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £555 | £201 | £235 | £947 | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £108 | £99 | £485 | £1.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Mar 2015 as amended on 28 Apr 2021 as amended on 21 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE AND OTHER AGENCIES PROVIDING SERVICES TO VICTIMS IN CUMBRIA BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THEM TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE SERVICES FOR VICTIMS OF CRIME. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR SICKNESS AS A RESULT OF BEING A VICTIM, WITNESS OR BEING AFFECTED BY CRIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOLWAY VIEW
TORPENHOW
WIGTON
CA7 1JA
- Phone:
- 07504713513
- Email:
- cvctcontact@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window