PLANTING FOR HOPE UGANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The formation and oversight of a women's cooperative, encouraging self-sufficiency through teaching sustainable farming and food production. Promoting education by supporting a local school purchased by the charity. Promoting health and hygiene through provision of clean water, medication and doctor, and medical outreach for the community including feeding programme for the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 April 2015: Standard registration
- PFHU (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE OAKLEY | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Simm | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE JAMES | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Cartledge | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.09k | £80.82k | £57.24k | £46.08k | £73.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.78k | £58.74k | £68.48k | £65.27k | £65.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2023
(These accounts |
13 June 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN KITITI SPECIFICALLY AND UGANDA GENERALLY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY · THE PROVISION OF A WEEKLY HEALTH CLINIC AND FREE MEDICINE · INCREASING SKILLS OF PEOPLE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS MORE SUSTAINABLY AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY · IMPROVING EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clent House
New Road
Caunsall
Kidderminster
DY11 5YN
- Phone:
- 01562850536
- Email:
- kateoakley135@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window