Trustees PLANTING FOR HOPE UGANDA
Charity number: 1161455

Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE OAKLEY | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Simm | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE JAMES | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Cartledge | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.