Financial history THE BRIDGE GROUP

Charity number: 1162144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £358.78k £280.30k £405.24k £338.69k £465.32k
Total expenditure £315.81k £318.02k £350.05k £366.58k £359.03k
Income from government contracts £5.04k £25.58k N/A N/A £35.84k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A