Financial history NEWCIS

Charity number: 1159934
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.54m £1.77m £1.71m £1.77m £1.98m
Total expenditure £1.45m £1.59m £1.56m £1.67m £1.99m
Income from government contracts £1.37m £1.69m £1.27m £1.43m £1.58m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.35k N/A £30.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84k £28.83k £3.53k £11.08k £17.11k
Income - Other trading activities £156.59k £47.67k £95.90k £113.10k £25.85k
Income - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.69m £1.59m £1.64m £1.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £709 £304 £0 £1.22k £3.22k
Income - Other £14.38k £9.51k £15.86k £11.03k £6.63k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.28m £1.37m £1.38m £1.40m £1.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £176.65k £217.47k £184.90k £271.05k £123.23k
Expenditure - Governance £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k £18.71k £21.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £316.10k £434.08k £357.40k £384.42k £660.51k
Expenditure - Investment management £245 £0 £0 £1.02k £1.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0