FISHING INTO THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is the 'Chart a course towards sustainable and prosperous UK fisheries'. We work with industry and a range of stakeholders to take action that makes a difference at critical points in relation to our mission. We work mainly in the fields of industry generated data, industry innovations, training for sustainability and providing a coordination and stakeholder engagement mechanism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £68,914 from 1 government grant(s)
People

37 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 January 2015: CIO registration
- FITF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Stevens | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Richard Kenneth Stride | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Douglas | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Magnus Laurence Johnson | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||
PAUL DAVID GILSON | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Wright | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Hoskin | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Lamplough | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beshlie Pool | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Catchpole | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian William Wightman | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Howe | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Ornsby | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Jarrad | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Warner | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asa Howe | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kara Brydson | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glen Thomas Annison | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aisling Jimi Lannin | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Davy McBryde | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Claire Price | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Glynn Davies | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Price | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Plotnek | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Fennell | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Park OBE | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Anderson | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor William Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Witney | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Kelly | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Mullenger | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michel Kaiser | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Curtis | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jimmy Buchan | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Bartlett | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN MACKINSON | Trustee | 23 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STEER | Trustee | 23 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.04k | £118.04k | £70.57k | £178.14k | £137.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.47k | £106.47k | £77.82k | £105.34k | £130.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £83.04k | £29.65k | £20.41k | £32.58k | £68.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN UK FISHERIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE MARINE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF MARINE RESOURCES; AND (II) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION IN UK FISHERIES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN UK FISHERIES AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE MARINE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FISHMONGERS CO
FISHMONGERS HALL
LONDON BRIDGE
LONDON
EC4R 9EL
- Phone:
- 07311812105
- Email:
- emma@fitf.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window