TYNE SOUND NEWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides free audio recordings of news information and entertainment for visually impaired people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 14 September 1976: Standard registration
- 15 January 2015: Funds received from 500841 THE TYNESIDE RECREATION CLUB FOR THE BLIND
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joe Spencer | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILL CARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS CALVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY MIZEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARY HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £256 | £96 | £252 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.37k | £7.32k | £5.72k | £3.01k | £2.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 21 MAY 1987 AND 13 MAY 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Pegasus Jesmond Assembly
Eskdale Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 4DH
- Phone:
- 07771776994
- Email:
- tynesoundnews@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window