Accounts and annual returns MARANATHA FULL GOSPEL CHURCH

Charity number: 1159668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 July 2024 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 July 2024 160 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 16 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 February 2021 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 February 2021 201 days late Download Open in new window