Financial history MARANATHA FULL GOSPEL CHURCH

Charity number: 1159668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.71k £2.32k £5.05k £5.64k £15.20k
Total expenditure £3.51k £1.54k £2.58k £6.00k £12.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A