THE OLD QUARRY ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE FREE OPEN ACCESS PLAY PROVISION FOR THE CHILDREN OF WARWICK ESTATE AND SURROUNDING AREAS. (6 - 16 years of age, children under 6 to be accompanied by a parent / main carer) Tuesday to Friday evenings from 3.30pm-5.30pm, and Saturdays from 12 pm-2.00pm INDOOR SPACE FOR ADULT LEISURE AND TRAINING ACTIVITIES IS AVAILABLE AT COMPETITIVE RATES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 16 September 1976: Standard registration
- 02 February 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1132807 THE OLD QUARRY ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND LTD
- WARWICK ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- WARWICK ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND PARENTS COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.81k | £19.93k | £28.68k | £52.79k | £92.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.30k | £12.49k | £34.74k | £49.67k | £68.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1976 AS AMENDED ON 12 APRIL 1995 AND 26 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE WARWICK ESTATE AREA OF KNOTTINGLEY BEING FACILITIES - (A) OF WHICH CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDIOTIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
WARWICK ESTATE AREA OF KNOTTINGLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window