COMMUNITY EDUCATION FOUNDATION & LYNCX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We achieve our objects by providing: 1 extra study support schooling to improve attainment levels for 5 -16 year olds 2 Sports programmes to enhance youth engagement and learning, 3 volunteering opportunities to improve work experience/career paths for 16 to 24 year olds, 4 targeted workshops to improve engagement, learning, leadership & personal development outcomes for youths & families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2024
Total income includes £88,850 from 10 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 February 2016: CIO registration
- CEF LYNCX (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAVLET WILLIAMSON | Chair | 14 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Clarke | Trustee | 29 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL-RAZAK MAHMOUD | Trustee | 14 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DONNA NELSON BA HONS | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | 03/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.61k | £196.30k | £263.69k | £274.12k | £309.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.62k | £145.00k | £224.62k | £279.94k | £266.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.25k | £40.63k | £163.50k | £123.51k | £88.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS TO 3.1 ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULARLY OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES FROM COMMUNITIES SUFFERING SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL, ECONOMIC AND/OR ENVIRONMENTAL DISADVANTAGE, SO THAT THEY DEVELOP THE BASIC SKILLS THEY NEED TO IMPROVE ATTAINMENT IN LITERACY, NUMERACY AND SCIENCE. 3.2 DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN LONDON IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED WITH THE SKILLS AND COMPETENCE THEY NEED TO PARTICIPATE FULLY SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
B5/6
Eurolink Business Centre
49 Effra Road
Brixton
London
SW2 1BZ
- Phone:
- 02077374274
- Email:
- community7@cefi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window