LAKESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funds for the benefit of the pupils of Lakeside Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cardiff
Governance
- 30 September 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Jane Budd | Chair | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Boast | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Eleri Morgan | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Parker | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mitchell | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.64k | £3.31k | £6.43k | £11.10k | £10.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.12k | £1.70k | £8.23k | £16.73k | £3.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPLIS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY). (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SUB CLAUSES 2 (A) AND (B) OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
CHILDREN OF LAKESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lakeside Primary School
Ontario Way
CARDIFF
CF23 6HB
- Phone:
- 02920767050
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window