Financial history KESSER YISROEL EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1160356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023 01/09/2024
Total gross income £6.65k £12.44k £23.92k £21.04k £22.40k
Total expenditure £6.64k £11.60k £24.61k £20.68k £21.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A